NY S02161 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.540
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the establishment of a program for the use of medication assisted treatment for inmates in both state and county correctional facilities; reporting requirements; substance use disorder treatment and transition services implemented in jails.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the establishment of a program for the use of medication assisted treatment for inmates in both state and county correctional facilities; reporting requirements; substance use disorder treatment and transition services implemented in jails.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.540
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a833b
2019-06-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-20AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-17SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2161B
2019-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2161A
2019-06-14SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-14Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-14AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.600
2019-03-11SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-01-23SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A00833 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s2161b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02161&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02161&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02161
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02161&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02161A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02161&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02161B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2161#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2161#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2161#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2161#SF2

Bill Comments

feedback