NY S02167 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Promotes the education of the human trafficking information and referral hotlines to assist persons in freeing themselves from severe acts or forms of sex trafficking.
Title
Promotes the education of the human trafficking information and referral hotlines to assist persons in freeing themselves from severe acts or forms of sex trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2167A |
2019-02-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A03192 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to economic development