NY S02174 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - referred to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - referred to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures adequate access to information by individuals who have limited English proficiency.
Title
Ensures adequate access to information by individuals who have limited English proficiency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2020-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.162 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2019-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.108 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A08470 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to social services