NY S02176 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - referred to small business
Pending: Assembly Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the creation of micro-business worker cooperatives upon transfer of ownership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the creation of micro-business worker cooperatives upon transfer of ownership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04Assemblyreferred to small business
2020-03-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-03-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-02-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-02-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-02-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.466
2020-01-21SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-06-14Assemblyreferred to small business
2019-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1376
2019-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-04-08SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-01-23SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10156 (Same As) 2020-03-24 - referred to small business

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback