NY S02177 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to burglary in the second degree; adds language where the building is a dwelling which, at the time of the commission of the crime, is occupied by a person who is not a participant in the crime to what constitutes burglary in the second degree.
Title
Relates to burglary in the second degree; adds language where the building is a dwelling which, at the time of the commission of the crime, is occupied by a person who is not a participant in the crime to what constitutes burglary in the second degree.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.978 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03058 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.127