NY S02178 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to establish residency restrictions for sex offenders required to register with the division of criminal justice services.
Title
Authorizes municipalities to establish residency restrictions for sex offenders required to register with the division of criminal justice services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1471 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.664 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07718 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to correction