NY S02187 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an individual shall not become ineligible under the EPIC program due to an increase in social security benefits or a public or private pension where such increase does not exceed the consumer price index.
Title
Provides that an individual shall not become ineligible under the EPIC program due to an increase in social security benefits or a public or private pension where such increase does not exceed the consumer price index.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.765 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2187B |
2020-07-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2187A |
2019-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.156 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A03145 (Same As) 2020-07-09 - print number 3145c