NY S02198 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of qualified agencies; adds public defenders, legal aid societies, and assigned counsel administrators.
Title
Relates to the definition of qualified agencies; adds public defenders, legal aid societies, and assigned counsel administrators.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.211 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.401 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7644 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1416 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07644 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.211