NY S02242 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notice to the commander of a military station of certain municipal actions that occur within 3000 feet of the property to be affected by the proposed action.
Title
Relates to notice to the commander of a military station of certain municipal actions that occur within 3000 feet of the property to be affected by the proposed action.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.203 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08218 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to local governments