NY S02244 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the local food, farms, and jobs act; relates to the procurement of locally grown farm and food products; sets goals for levels of procurement by state agencies; creates the New York state council on food policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the local food, farms, and jobs act; relates to the procurement of locally grown farm and food products; sets goals for levels of procurement by state agencies; creates the New York state council on food policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2019-05-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-08SenateAMENDED 2244B
2019-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.601
2019-03-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 2244A
2019-03-22SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-03-18SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-01-23SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

A07049 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - print number 7049a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02244&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02244&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02244
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02244&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02244A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02244&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02244B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2244#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2244#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2244#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback