NY S02270 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - signed chap.32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - signed chap.32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the "Finger Lakes community preservation act"; prohibits the siting of newly constructed incineration facilities in the Finger Lakes region.
Title
Creates the "Finger Lakes community preservation act"; prohibits the siting of newly constructed incineration facilities in the Finger Lakes region.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Bob Antonacci [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | signed chap.32 |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.169 |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2270A |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.118 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-21 | Senate | print number 5029a |
2019-02-21 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to energy |
2019-02-06 | Senate | referred to energy |
2019-03-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5029A |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 2270A |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.169 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05029 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - signed chap.32