NY S02279 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - approval memo.59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - approval memo.59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to HIV post-exposure prophylaxis and other health care services for sexual assault victims.
Title
Relates to HIV post-exposure prophylaxis and other health care services for sexual assault victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | approval memo.59 |
2019-12-18 | Senate | signed chap.681 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1536 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2279A |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.236 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | rules report cal.236 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-10 | Senate | print number 1204a |
2019-06-10 | Senate | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-02-11 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-29 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-14 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1204A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1536 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2279A |
2019-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01204 (Same As) 2019-12-18 - approval memo.59