NY S02283 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing a help/crisis line to assist veterans.
Title
Relates to providing a help/crisis line to assist veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2019-05-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2283A |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.338 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A08390 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to veterans' affairs