NY S02300 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - SIGNED CHAP.411
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-24 - SIGNED CHAP.411
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the voter friendly ballot act; relates to the form of the ballot for elections; removes additional provisions for primary elections for New York city.
Title
Enacts the voter friendly ballot act; relates to the form of the ballot for elections; removes additional provisions for primary elections for New York city.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.411 |
2019-10-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.33 |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | substituted for a2682a |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | AMENDED 2300A |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.160 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02682 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - SIGNED CHAP.411