NY S02302 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a consumer reporting agency or lender from using the credit scores of members of an individual's social network to determine the credit worthiness of such individual.
Title
Prohibits a consumer reporting agency or lender from using the credit scores of members of an individual's social network to determine the credit worthiness of such individual.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.540 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.546 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2302 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-30 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.415 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-08 | Senate | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5294 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.546 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05294 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.540