NY S02315 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-05-07Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-07Assemblyordered to third reading cal.243
2019-05-07Assemblysubstituted for a4734
2019-03-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-03-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-01-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-01-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.65
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING

Same As/Similar To

A04734 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - substituted by s2315

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback