NY S02341 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires courts, prior to accepting a plea to a misdemeanor or violation, to provide notice to the defendant that such plea and the acceptance thereof could result in deportation, removal from the United States, exclusion from the United States or denial of citizenship, if the defendant is not a citizen of the United States.
Title
Requires courts, prior to accepting a plea to a misdemeanor or violation, to provide notice to the defendant that such plea and the acceptance thereof could result in deportation, removal from the United States, exclusion from the United States or denial of citizenship, if the defendant is not a citizen of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.213 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02321 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes