NY S02345 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - SIGNED CHAP.64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - SIGNED CHAP.64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the alienation and substitution of certain parklands in the town of Amherst in the county of Erie.
Title
Relates to the alienation and substitution of certain parklands in the town of Amherst in the county of Erie.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.64 |
2013-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | home rule request |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.398 |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a3882a |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2013-05-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2345A |
2013-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.432 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03882 (Same As) 2013-05-30 - substituted by s2345a