NY S02345 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires children under the age of eighteen to wear protective headgear while skiing or snowboarding; imposes civil fines for violations thereof; applies safety in skiing code requirements to snowboarders and snowboarding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires children under the age of eighteen to wear protective headgear while skiing or snowboarding; imposes civil fines for violations thereof; applies safety in skiing code requirements to snowboarders and snowboarding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.304
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A01405 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - reported referred to rules

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback