NY S02356 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2892A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2892A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that prepaid cellular telephone cards have the expiration date of the minutes purchased printed on the card in conspicuous print.
Title
Requires that prepaid cellular telephone cards have the expiration date of the minutes purchased printed on the card in conspicuous print.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2892A |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2032 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-11-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2356A |
2017-11-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02892 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES