NY S02361 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Categorizes hate crimes as serious offenses in relation to possession of firearms.
Title
Categorizes hate crimes as serious offenses in relation to possession of firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.280 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2361A |
2020-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06263 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - print number 6263a