NY S02371 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to making false statements to district attorneys, assistant district attorneys or district attorney investigators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to making false statements to district attorneys, assistant district attorneys or district attorney investigators.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1377
2019-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 2371B
2019-06-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2019-05-31SenatePRINT NUMBER 2371A
2019-05-31SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A06480 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - print number 6480a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback