NY S02387 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to menstrual product labeling; requires label affixed thereto or a package insert, upon which there shall be plainly and conspicuously printed a list of all ingredients which shall be listed in order of predominance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to menstrual product labeling; requires label affixed thereto or a package insert, upon which there shall be plainly and conspicuously printed a list of all ingredients which shall be listed in order of predominance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.313
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a164b
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-17AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-13SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2387B
2019-06-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2387A
2019-06-06SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-06Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-06AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-05-06Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2019-05-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-29Senate1ST REPORT CAL.459
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES

Same As/Similar To

A00164 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s2387b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02387&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02387&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02387
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02387&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02387A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02387&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02387B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2387#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2387#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2387#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02387&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback