NY S02398 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.231
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.231
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Congregation Beth-El Sephardic Center to retroactively apply for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes Congregation Beth-El Sephardic Center to retroactively apply for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.231 |
2017-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.219 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a5543b |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2398B |
2017-04-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2398A |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.454 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05543 (Same As) 2017-06-14 - substituted by s2398b