NY S02399 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides additional discharge planning for persons being released from civil confinement including supervision, electronic monitoring, appropriate clothing, transportation, medication and a service plan.
Title
Provides additional discharge planning for persons being released from civil confinement including supervision, electronic monitoring, appropriate clothing, transportation, medication and a service plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2013-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-04-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2013-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02733 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to mental health