NY S02402 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires ATM machines to release ATM cards with EVM chips prior to disbursing cash or a receipt and defines EVM chip and related terms.
Title
Requires ATM machines to release ATM cards with EVM chips prior to disbursing cash or a receipt and defines EVM chip and related terms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.648 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |