NY S02405 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes crime of aggravated criminal conduct to provide more severe penalties for persons who have committed 3 or more qualifying misdemeanors or felonies within ten years of the present class A misdemeanor offense.
Title
Establishes crime of aggravated criminal conduct to provide more severe penalties for persons who have committed 3 or more qualifying misdemeanors or felonies within ten years of the present class A misdemeanor offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1273 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.492 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02151 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes