NY S02411 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.398
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.398
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the effectiveness of the New York state ocean acidification task force from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2023 and to requiring an interim report and hearing by the task force.
Title
Relates to extending the effectiveness of the New York state ocean acidification task force from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2023 and to requiring an interim report and hearing by the task force.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.398 |
2019-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.232 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | substituted for a2573 |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.80 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02573 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.398