NY S02420 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.424
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the definition of eligible securities in relation to obligations of domestic corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the definition of eligible securities in relation to obligations of domestic corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.424
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-12Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.92
2018-06-12Assemblysubstituted for a2881b
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1134
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO BANKS
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2420B
2017-05-10SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2420A
2017-04-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-04-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-04-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.531
2017-01-13SenateREFERRED TO BANKS

Same As/Similar To

A02881 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - substituted by s2420b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02420&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02420&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02420
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02420&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02420A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02420&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02420B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2420#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2420#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2420#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2420#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02420&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback