NY S02424 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the state director of veterans' affairs to submit a plan once every 5 years to the veterans' affairs commission for the provision of services to service-disabled veterans; directs such commission to approve such plan prior to its implementation.
Title
Directs the state director of veterans' affairs to submit a plan once every 5 years to the veterans' affairs commission for the provision of services to service-disabled veterans; directs such commission to approve such plan prior to its implementation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2018-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.513 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2017-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2424B |
2017-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.512 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2424A |
2017-02-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A05931 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - tabled