NY S02424 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a credit for purchase, construction or retrofitting of a principal residence to achieve universal visitability pursuant to guidelines developed by the division of code enforcement and administration within the department of state; caps tax credits awarded at 1 million dollars per year for 5 years.
Title
Relates to a credit for purchase, construction or retrofitting of a principal residence to achieve universal visitability pursuant to guidelines developed by the division of code enforcement and administration within the department of state; caps tax credits awarded at 1 million dollars per year for 5 years.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-11-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.138 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.997 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2424 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.336 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-23 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2493 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.997 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A02493 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - tabled