NY S02433 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2329A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2329A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes racetracks and off-track betting corporations to offer rebates on pari-mutuel wagers made by bettors to reward horse racing patrons for their participation at race meetings.
Title
Authorizes racetracks and off-track betting corporations to offer rebates on pari-mutuel wagers made by bettors to reward horse racing patrons for their participation at race meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2329A |
2013-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1428 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2433A |
2013-05-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-04-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A02329 (Same As) 2013-11-13 - approval memo.5