NY S02439 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to the adoption of instruction in information relating to blood, bone marrow and organ and tissue donations in senior high schools.
Title
Requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to the adoption of instruction in information relating to blood, bone marrow and organ and tissue donations in senior high schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.339 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03575 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education