NY S02448 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - SIGNED CHAP.130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the possession, manufacture, transport and disposition of rapid-fire modification devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the possession, manufacture, transport and disposition of rapid-fire modification devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-29AssemblySIGNED CHAP.130
2019-07-29SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-01-29Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-01-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-29Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.21
2019-01-29Assemblysubstituted for a2684
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-01-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-28SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.92
2019-01-28SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A02684 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - substituted by s2448

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback