NY S02449 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the municipal gun buyback program by the division of state police for the voluntary return of guns; establishes the municipal gun buyback program fund to fund the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the municipal gun buyback program by the division of state police for the voluntary return of guns; establishes the municipal gun buyback program fund to fund the program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-31AssemblySIGNED CHAP.139
2019-07-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-01-29Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-01-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-29Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.22
2019-01-29Assemblysubstituted for a2685
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-01-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-28SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.93
2019-01-28SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A02685 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - substituted by s2449

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback