NY S02455 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.498
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.498
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to voiding and rendering unenforceable contract provisions limiting certain speech by contractees.
Title
Relates to voiding and rendering unenforceable contract provisions limiting certain speech by contractees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.498 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.219 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2455A |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.116 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.116 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3548 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2455A |
2019-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.219 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06544 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
A03548 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.498
S03349 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
A03548 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.498
S03349 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN