NY S02461 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.394
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.394
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing angling by a single individual with up to three lines in freshwater; extends effectiveness of provisions for two years.
Title
Relates to authorizing angling by a single individual with up to three lines in freshwater; extends effectiveness of provisions for two years.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.394 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1419 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2461 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.229 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | rules report cal.229 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8140 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1419 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08140 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - signed chap.394