NY S02463 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the governor to publicize the criteria used when granting a commutation, pardon or reprieve; and requires disclosure of information related to such commutations, pardons or reprieves within 30 days instead of annually.
Title
Relates to requiring the governor to publicize the criteria used when granting a commutation, pardon or reprieve; and requires disclosure of information related to such commutations, pardons or reprieves within 30 days instead of annually.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-07 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |