NY S02469 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state university of New York and the city university of New York to examine and conduct a study on the availability of campus services, programs and resources for veteran students.
Title
Requires the state university of New York and the city university of New York to examine and conduct a study on the availability of campus services, programs and resources for veteran students.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.470 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A04480 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education