NY S02484 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits auto lenders from remotely disabling a vehicle without first giving notice of the disabling to the debtor.
Title
Prohibits auto lenders from remotely disabling a vehicle without first giving notice of the disabling to the debtor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.312 |
2018-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.931 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10160 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2033 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05238 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - enacting clause stricken
A07855 (Same As) 2017-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.249
A10160 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s2484
A07855 (Same As) 2017-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.249
A10160 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s2484