NY S02494 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits littering on state park lands.
Title
Prohibits littering on state park lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2020-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.122 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-02-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.126 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09919 (Same As) 2020-02-27 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development