NY S02496 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.331
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.331
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "living donor protection act of 2018"; prohibits discrimination in the provision of life, accident, and health insurance based on the status of an insured as a living organ or tissue donor; authorizes the provision of family leave to provide care during transplantation preparation and recovery from surgery related to organ or tissue donation; and directs the commissioner of health to develop and distribute informational materials relating to the benefits of being a living organ or tissue donor.
Title
Enacts the "living donor protection act of 2018"; prohibits discrimination in the provision of life, accident, and health insurance based on the status of an insured as a living organ or tissue donor; authorizes the provision of family leave to provide care during transplantation preparation and recovery from surgery related to organ or tissue donation; and directs the commissioner of health to develop and distribute informational materials relating to the benefits of being a living organ or tissue donor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-05 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.331 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.400 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a297c |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1931 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2496B |
2018-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2496A |
2018-01-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-05-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.612 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00297 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s2496b