NY S02497 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.176
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.176
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a child less than ten years of age from being left unattended in a motor vehicle under conditions presenting substantial risk.
Title
Prohibits a child less than ten years of age from being left unattended in a motor vehicle under conditions presenting substantial risk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.176 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.103 |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | substituted for a1851 |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.150 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01851 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.176