NY S02503 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the inclusion of a check off box on personal income tax return forms for the purpose of making a gift to the William B. Hoyt Memorial Children and Family trust fund for child abuse prevention.
Title
Provides for the inclusion of a check off box on personal income tax return forms for the purpose of making a gift to the William B. Hoyt Memorial Children and Family trust fund for child abuse prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.387 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1756 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2503 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.392 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2456 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1756 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A02456 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - signed chap.387