NY S02508 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - signed chap.151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - signed chap.151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the crime of staging a motor vehicle accident.
Title
Creates the crime of staging a motor vehicle accident.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | signed chap.151 |
2019-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.805 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2508 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-06 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.241 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-31 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3985 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.805 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03985 (Same As) 2019-08-08 - signed chap.151