NY S02519 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the taking of non-native big game mammals in a fenced or other area from which there is no means for such mammal to escape.
Title
Prohibits the taking of non-native big game mammals in a fenced or other area from which there is no means for such mammal to escape.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Monica Martinez [D] |
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1025 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00883 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation