NY S02520 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 2520C
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 2520C
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the state of emergency small business and not-for-profit organization loan program.
Title
Establishes the state of emergency small business and not-for-profit organization loan program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2520C |
2020-03-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2520B |
2020-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2520A |
2020-03-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A10212 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - reference changed to banks