NY S02521 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a senior dental services grant program; authorizes the director to establish the program and, upon the availability of appropriations, provide grants to eligible elderly persons who are in need of such services.
Title
Establishes a senior dental services grant program; authorizes the director to establish the program and, upon the availability of appropriations, provide grants to eligible elderly persons who are in need of such services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2521A |
2019-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A04556 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to aging