NY S02534 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A857
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A857
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the uniform guardianship and protective proceedings jurisdiction act.
Title
Enacts the uniform guardianship and protective proceedings jurisdiction act.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. Mark Grisanti [R] | Sen. Thomas Libous [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A857 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.173 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00857 (Same As) 2013-10-23 - signed chap.427