NY S02537 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing an electronic automated system for applications and waiting lists and to developing a written procedure for applicant selection and rejection.
Title
Relates to establishing an electronic automated system for applications and waiting lists and to developing a written procedure for applicant selection and rejection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1095 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2537A |
2019-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05175 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - signed chap.455